+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2068ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 091312870-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2068E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Hogan, Clarke N.)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 091312870
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor