+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2068ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute from Education agreed to 13104064D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 13104064D-EH1
- Committee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2068EH1
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 13104064D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103539D