+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2063ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2063H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104329D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104329D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103365D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor