+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (81-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102411D