+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2061ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100054D
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
February 19, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N)
January 21, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor