+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 200 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2058ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 035992671
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor