+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective 7/1/97)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2058ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2058ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 979004825-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 979004825
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1997: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor