+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2058ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 15105662D-H1
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Ruff, Petersen, Carrico
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Kilgore, Scott, Preston
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15105049D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2058S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105049D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105049D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 12-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 2-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103347D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 26, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
February 24, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N 1-A)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 2-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor