+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2057ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2057H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104827D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104827D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: #3 Chesapeake
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102227D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor