+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2057ER)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 17-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 978017260-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read second time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 978017260
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1997: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 17-N)
January 20, 1997: Reported from L. & C. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor