+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 461 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2055ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2055H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077835412-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 077835412-H1
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073039412
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor