+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2050ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 993455817