+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
On March 20, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2050ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 973631160-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 973631160
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor