+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (46-Y 51-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action rejected by House (46-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 51-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (49-Y 51-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13102214D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2049E
- Amendments by Delegate Rust agreed to
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (18-Y 4-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102214D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 51-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: RECONSIDER (46-Y 51-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 4-N)
January 21, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor