+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2045ER)
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 032341996-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 032341996
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2003: Reported from Finance with amds (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor