+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2045ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13101381D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2045E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101381D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor