+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective - see bill)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2042ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2042H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104322D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104322D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101400D
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor