+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 111 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2041ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103601D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor