+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0917)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 917 (effective 7/1/05)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2038ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2038ER)
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2038S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 051559316-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 051559316-S1
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 051916316-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2038E
- Amendment by Del. Hamilton agreed to
- Committee amendments #2 and #3 agreed to
- Committee amendment #1 rejected
- Read second time
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051916316
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor