+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
On March 23, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 542 (effective-see bill)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2038ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 012383924-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 012383924-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (23-Y 16-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 012383924-S1
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (11-Y 3-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 018863924-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 018863924
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (23-Y 16-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (11-Y 3-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2001: Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor