+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 393 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2036ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 056833316-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2036E
- Amendments by Del. Hamilton agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056833316