+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
On March 21, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2035ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 2
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 992520362