+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0858)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 858 (effective 10/1/08)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2035ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 17-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 17-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2035ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 17-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 077647316-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Peace agreed to
- Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2035EH1
- Printed as engrossed 077647316-EH1
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources (Hamilton)
- Committee substitute printed 077647316-H1
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074624316
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 17-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor