+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by voice vote
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House (94-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 990134276-E
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 4-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Agriculture (17-Y 7-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 2
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 990134276
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 1999: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendment (20-Y 4-N)
January 29, 1999: Reported from Agriculture (17-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor