+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/06)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB203ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: #2 FOIA/Procurement (Marshall, D.)
On January 3, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065301396