+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2029ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed bill reprinted 092022612-E
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 092022612-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2029E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 2
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092022612
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
January 30, 2009: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor