+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2028ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 013352644
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 31, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: Reported from Agriculture (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor