+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103851D