+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 7, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0837)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (34-Y 3-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 837 (effective 7/1/97)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (34-Y 3-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2028ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2028ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 14-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (85-Y 14-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 7-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (13-Y 2-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 972033432-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 972033432-H1
- Read second time
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 972033432-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (17-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 973619352