+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 4/9/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB202ER)
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed LD7676124 (HB202H2)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Gartlan, Holland, R.J., Wampler, Schewel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (2-Y 93-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 93-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7221605 (HB202S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD7939124 (HB202H1)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (37-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (2-Y 93-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor