+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
On March 2, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 75 (effective 3/2/97)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2017ER)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 974766492