+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2016ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2016H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105027D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105027D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102042D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor