+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2016ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2016H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 070889520-H1
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 070889520-H1
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing (Suit)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 075220520
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor