+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (56-Y 42-N)
- Read third time and passed House (56-Y 42-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2014H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104047D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21104047D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102649D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 42-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2021: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
January 28, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor