+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2012ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 070967520-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2012E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 070967520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor