+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2012ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 055405216
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2005: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor