+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2012ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21100411D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2012E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100411D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 2021: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2021: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2021: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor