+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (43-Y 55-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (43-Y 55-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Delegate Ebbin agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 093634492-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093634492-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends striking from the docket by voice vote
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 2
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093559492
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2009: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (43-Y 55-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor