+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2010ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103562D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor