+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Gartlan, Holland, R. J., Wampler
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 87-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 87-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7215605 (HB201S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (77-Y 18-N)
- Reengrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Amendments by Del. Giesen agreed to
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD7948124 (HB201EH1)
- Amendments by Del. Ball agreed to
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute/with amds.
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD7948124 (HB201H1)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (19-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 87-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 18-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (19-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor