+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/10)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB201ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB201ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105840D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105840D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB201S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105840D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB201H2
- Substitute by Delegate Alexander agreed to 10104999D-H2
- Floor substitute printed 10104999D-H2 (Alexander)
- Committee substitute rejected 10104103D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10104103D-H1
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #3
On January 8, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103141D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2010: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor