+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
On March 8, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 178 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2007ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 977306486-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 977306486
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor