+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
- Enacted, Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/13)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2005ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 1-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2005ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2005H2
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 13104819D-H2
- Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 13104500D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104819D-H2
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 13104500D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103357D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor