+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Conference report rejected by House (29-Y 61-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 61-N 1-A)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (30-Y 9-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 9-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 018182880-H2
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 018176476-S1
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (20-Y 18-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 018176476-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate sub. rejected by House 018176476-S1 (0-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (25-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (25-Y 14-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Parrish, Howell, Cranwell
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: K.G. Miller, Stosch, Colgan
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 018176476-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 012917880-EH1
- Engrossed by House - com sub w/amd 012917880-EH1
- Amendment by Del. Griffith agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 012917880-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 012917880-H1
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 012812880
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 61-N 1-A)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (30-Y 9-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (25-Y 14-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (20-Y 18-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2001: Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor