+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 411 (effective 7/1/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2002ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 093087472-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2002E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093087472