+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Incorporated by Labor and Commerce (HB981-Herring) by voice vote
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB981-Herring) by voice vote
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100461D
+ − Sponsor
Joseph C. Lindsey
Type:
Primary Sponsor