+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 165 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/25/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB20ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100118D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2016: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N)
February 22, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
January 26, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N)
January 20, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor