+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1999ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 31-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (65-Y 31-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 13105550D-H2
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stanley, Carrico, Barker
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Delegates: Greason, Bell, R.P., Toscano
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 5-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 90-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 13105260D-S1 (4-Y 90-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105260D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1999S1
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105260D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 40-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 40-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104696D-H1
- Read second time
- Amendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected
- Amendment by Delegate Krupicka rejected
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1999H1
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104696D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103542D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 31-N)
February 20, 2013: Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 5-N)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 90-N)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
February 4, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 40-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
January 29, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor