+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (57)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0914)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 914 (effective 4/6/05)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1997ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1997ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Griffith, Hurt, Watts
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stolle, Blevins, Marsh
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1997S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053861308S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 053861308-S1
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1997H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 054413104-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 054413104-H1
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057922104