+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1997ER)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1997H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105968D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105968D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102569D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor